07/09/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 63, Statutes of 2021. | |||
07/09/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |||
Senate | 06/24/2021 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2021 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2091.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 21). | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2021 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2021 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2021 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1095.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2021 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2021 | Set for hearing May 10. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2021 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 943.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2021 | Set for hearing April 27. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2021 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |