California 2021 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR27 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/25/2021

                    Enrolled  June 25, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  May 13, 2021 Passed IN  Assembly  June 24, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 27Introduced by Senator McGuire(Coauthor: Assembly Member Levine)March 23, 2021 Relative to the Jeffrey Stevenson Memorial Bike Path. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 27, McGuire. Jeffrey Stevenson Memorial Bike Path.This measure would designate a specified bike path in the County of Marin as the Jeffrey Stevenson Memorial Bike Path. The measure would request that the Department of Transportation determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES Bill TextWHEREAS, Jeffrey Stevenson was a doctor for over 32 years in the Bay Area and served the Marin community in general practice and occupational medicine; andWHEREAS, He ran a clinic to treat and advocate for hundreds of first responders and families; andWHEREAS, Jeffrey was a veteran, having served in the United States Army Medical Corps during the United States invasion of Panama; andWHEREAS, He volunteered for the infantry, and spent part of his time in the military racing bicycles in Europe for the Armys world championship team; andWHEREAS, By the end of his service, he had achieved the rank of Captain; andWHEREAS, Jeffrey was born in Berkeley, California, and graduated from UC Berkeley in 1978; andWHEREAS, He obtained his medical degree from George Washington University in 1986; andWHEREAS, Jeffrey was also an avid cyclist and enjoyed working on vintage cars and motorcycleshe especially loved driving his 1966 Alfa Romeo Giulia Super; andWHEREAS, Jeffrey served as president of the Marin Medical Society to further advocate for injured workers access to care, volunteered in the Rotary Club of Novato Sunrise, founded a nonprofit soccer team for youth in Marin, and helped start a bike-to-school program in Novato, California; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes Dr. Jeffrey Stevensons contributions to the people of California and designates the bike path, which was formerly known as Pacheco Hill Path, with entrances on the east side of Pacheco Creek Bridge and the intersection of Marinwood Avenue and Miller Creek Road in the County of Marin as the Jeffrey Stevenson Memorial Bike Path; and be it furtherResolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs, consistent with applicable signing requirements, showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  June 25, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  May 13, 2021 Passed IN  Assembly  June 24, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 27Introduced by Senator McGuire(Coauthor: Assembly Member Levine)March 23, 2021 Relative to the Jeffrey Stevenson Memorial Bike Path. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 27, McGuire. Jeffrey Stevenson Memorial Bike Path.This measure would designate a specified bike path in the County of Marin as the Jeffrey Stevenson Memorial Bike Path. The measure would request that the Department of Transportation determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES 

 Enrolled  June 25, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  May 13, 2021 Passed IN  Assembly  June 24, 2021

Enrolled  June 25, 2021
Passed IN  Senate  May 13, 2021
Passed IN  Assembly  June 24, 2021

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Concurrent Resolution 

No. 27

Introduced by Senator McGuire(Coauthor: Assembly Member Levine)March 23, 2021

Introduced by Senator McGuire(Coauthor: Assembly Member Levine)
March 23, 2021

 Relative to the Jeffrey Stevenson Memorial Bike Path. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SCR 27, McGuire. Jeffrey Stevenson Memorial Bike Path.

This measure would designate a specified bike path in the County of Marin as the Jeffrey Stevenson Memorial Bike Path. The measure would request that the Department of Transportation determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, erect those signs.

This measure would designate a specified bike path in the County of Marin as the Jeffrey Stevenson Memorial Bike Path. The measure would request that the Department of Transportation determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, erect those signs.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Jeffrey Stevenson was a doctor for over 32 years in the Bay Area and served the Marin community in general practice and occupational medicine; and

WHEREAS, He ran a clinic to treat and advocate for hundreds of first responders and families; and

WHEREAS, Jeffrey was a veteran, having served in the United States Army Medical Corps during the United States invasion of Panama; and

WHEREAS, He volunteered for the infantry, and spent part of his time in the military racing bicycles in Europe for the Armys world championship team; and

WHEREAS, By the end of his service, he had achieved the rank of Captain; and

WHEREAS, Jeffrey was born in Berkeley, California, and graduated from UC Berkeley in 1978; and

WHEREAS, He obtained his medical degree from George Washington University in 1986; and

WHEREAS, Jeffrey was also an avid cyclist and enjoyed working on vintage cars and motorcycleshe especially loved driving his 1966 Alfa Romeo Giulia Super; and

WHEREAS, Jeffrey served as president of the Marin Medical Society to further advocate for injured workers access to care, volunteered in the Rotary Club of Novato Sunrise, founded a nonprofit soccer team for youth in Marin, and helped start a bike-to-school program in Novato, California; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes Dr. Jeffrey Stevensons contributions to the people of California and designates the bike path, which was formerly known as Pacheco Hill Path, with entrances on the east side of Pacheco Creek Bridge and the intersection of Marinwood Avenue and Miller Creek Road in the County of Marin as the Jeffrey Stevenson Memorial Bike Path; and be it further

Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs, consistent with applicable signing requirements, showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.