07/09/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 65, Statutes of 2021. | |||
07/09/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |||
Senate | 07/05/2021 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2021 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2208.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 24). | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2021 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 715.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2021 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |