|
05/13/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 54, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2022
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:20 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4475.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2022
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2243.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2021
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/21/2021
|
Set for hearing August 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 1940.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2021
|
Set for hearing July 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2021
|
June 24 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2021
|
Set for hearing June 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|