1 | | - | Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 46 CHAPTER 91 Relative to California Tourism Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State July 16, 2021. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 46, Umberg. California Tourism Month.This measure would proclaim the month of May 2021 as California Tourism Month and would urge the citizens of this great state to support tourism and local businesses by traveling in state as an act of civic pride.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Tourism has been a consistent driver of Californias economy and workforce; andWHEREAS, A robust travel industry provides significant economic benefits for California, generating more than $144 billion dollars in visitor spending in 2019; andWHEREAS, Travel has been the foundation of a healthy workforce, serving as one of the largest private-sector employers in California, supporting 1.2 million jobs in 2019; andWHEREAS, Spending by travelers benefits all Californians, generating $12.2 billion dollars in state and local tax revenue in 2019 to support essential public services and programs; andWHEREAS, Travel and tourism-dependent businesses and organizations, 83 percent of which are small businesses, are responsible for welcoming visitors from all around the world to explore California and all our state has to offer; andWHEREAS, In 2020, the coronavirus pandemic devastated every sector of the travel industry with staggering economic consequences, affecting every community in California; and WHEREAS, California lost $79.8 billion dollars in visitor spending in 2020, a 55-percent decline from the previous year, and lost $6.1 billion dollars in tax revenue, a 50-percent drop; andWHEREAS, Nearly one million of Californians working in travel and hospitality lost their jobs in the first month of the pandemic and the employment sector remains by far the hardest hit in California; and WHEREAS, The travel industry cannot recover without the full return of leisure and business travel, as well as meetings and events, by both domestic and international visitors; and WHEREAS, The rebound of travel will drive the rebuilding of Californias economy and workforce; andWHEREAS, The California Legislature in 2016 declared every May as California Tourism Month to celebrate the positive economic impact of the tourism in California; andWHEREAS, Californians can help put their fellow Californians back to work and support the recovery of local businesses by traveling in California; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims May 2021 as California Tourism Month, and urges the citizens of this great state to support tourism and local businesses by traveling in state as an act of civic pride; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled July 13, 2021 Passed IN Senate May 20, 2021 Passed IN Assembly July 08, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 46Introduced by Senator Umberg(Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Quirk-Silva)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Bigelow, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Bryan, Burke, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chau, Chiu, Choi, Cooley, Cooper, Megan Dahle, Daly, Davies, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Lorena Gonzalez, Gray, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Mullin, Nazarian, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Seyarto, Smith, Stone, Ting, Valladares, Villapudua, Voepel, Waldron, Ward, Akilah Weber, Wicks, and Wood)May 11, 2021 Relative to California Tourism Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 46, Umberg. California Tourism Month.This measure would proclaim the month of May 2021 as California Tourism Month and would urge the citizens of this great state to support tourism and local businesses by traveling in state as an act of civic pride.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Tourism has been a consistent driver of Californias economy and workforce; andWHEREAS, A robust travel industry provides significant economic benefits for California, generating more than $144 billion dollars in visitor spending in 2019; andWHEREAS, Travel has been the foundation of a healthy workforce, serving as one of the largest private-sector employers in California, supporting 1.2 million jobs in 2019; andWHEREAS, Spending by travelers benefits all Californians, generating $12.2 billion dollars in state and local tax revenue in 2019 to support essential public services and programs; andWHEREAS, Travel and tourism-dependent businesses and organizations, 83 percent of which are small businesses, are responsible for welcoming visitors from all around the world to explore California and all our state has to offer; andWHEREAS, In 2020, the coronavirus pandemic devastated every sector of the travel industry with staggering economic consequences, affecting every community in California; and WHEREAS, California lost $79.8 billion dollars in visitor spending in 2020, a 55-percent decline from the previous year, and lost $6.1 billion dollars in tax revenue, a 50-percent drop; andWHEREAS, Nearly one million of Californians working in travel and hospitality lost their jobs in the first month of the pandemic and the employment sector remains by far the hardest hit in California; and WHEREAS, The travel industry cannot recover without the full return of leisure and business travel, as well as meetings and events, by both domestic and international visitors; and WHEREAS, The rebound of travel will drive the rebuilding of Californias economy and workforce; andWHEREAS, The California Legislature in 2016 declared every May as California Tourism Month to celebrate the positive economic impact of the tourism in California; andWHEREAS, Californians can help put their fellow Californians back to work and support the recovery of local businesses by traveling in California; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims May 2021 as California Tourism Month, and urges the citizens of this great state to support tourism and local businesses by traveling in state as an act of civic pride; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|