09/10/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 126, Statutes of 2021. | |||
09/10/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |||
Senate | 08/23/2021 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2021 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2440.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 07/15/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 15). | ||
Assembly | 07/15/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/12/2021 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 07/12/2021 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1904.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2021 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2021 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |