09/10/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 127, Statutes of 2021. | |||
09/10/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |||
Senate | 09/01/2021 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 09/01/2021 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2665.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 30). | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2021 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2021 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2090.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 07/14/2021 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/05/2021 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |