1 | | - | Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 58 CHAPTER 146 Relative to One Health Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State September 17, 2021. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 58, Hurtado. One Health DayThis measure would proclaim November 3, 2021, as One Health Day, to celebrate and bring attention to the need for a One Health approach to address shared health threats at the human-animal-environmental interface.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, One Health is a collaborative, multisectoral, and transdisciplinary approach working at the local, regional, national, and global levels with the goal of achieving optimal health outcomes recognizing the intersection between people, animals, plants, and their shared environment; and WHEREAS, The link between human and animal health can be seen quite clearly with bovine tuberculosis and brucellosis. Both are zoonotic diseases, meaning they can spread from animals to people; and WHEREAS, Bovine tuberculosis and brucellosis are bacterial diseases most commonly found in cattle and other animals, such as bison, elk, and deer, as well as cattle, goats, and sheep. People can become infected with bovine tuberculosis and brucellosis by consuming contaminated, unpasteurized, raw milk or dairy products or through direct contact with infected live animals or carcasses; andWHEREAS, In the United States, it was once common for bovine tuberculosis and brucellosis to spread from animals to people, but efforts to eliminate both diseases in cattle and routine pasteurization of cows milk have led to a dramatic decline in the amount of human cases; andWHEREAS, In the early 1900s, about 20 percent of tuberculosis cases in humans were caused by bovine tuberculosis. Today, that number is less than 2 percent. From 1931 to 1941, about 29,600 cases of brucellosis in people were reported, but from 1993 to 2010, the number of reported human cases was less than 2,000; andWHEREAS, One Health Day provides an opportunity for experts and the community to join together in One Health education and awareness, including sharing stories about One Health in action, like the one detailed above; andWHEREAS, Communication, coordination, and collaboration among partners working in animal, human, and environmental health, as well as other relevant partners, are an essential part of the One Health approach; and WHEREAS, Working together allows us to have the biggest impact on improving health for people, animals, and our shared environment; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims November 3, 2021, as One Health Day, a global campaign that celebrates and brings attention to the need for a One Health approach to address shared health threats at the human-animal-environmental interface; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled September 10, 2021 Passed IN Senate September 01, 2021 Passed IN Assembly September 07, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 58Introduced by Senator Hurtado(Coauthor: Senator Caballero)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bennett, Berman, Bigelow, Boerner Horvath, Mia Bonta, Bryan, Burke, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chau, Chen, Chiu, Choi, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Megan Dahle, Davies, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Smith, Stone, Ting, Valladares, Villapudua, Voepel, Waldron, Ward, Akilah Weber, Wicks, and Wood)August 18, 2021 Relative to One Health Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 58, Hurtado. One Health DayThis measure would proclaim November 3, 2021, as One Health Day, to celebrate and bring attention to the need for a One Health approach to address shared health threats at the human-animal-environmental interface.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, One Health is a collaborative, multisectoral, and transdisciplinary approach working at the local, regional, national, and global levels with the goal of achieving optimal health outcomes recognizing the intersection between people, animals, plants, and their shared environment; and WHEREAS, The link between human and animal health can be seen quite clearly with bovine tuberculosis and brucellosis. Both are zoonotic diseases, meaning they can spread from animals to people; and WHEREAS, Bovine tuberculosis and brucellosis are bacterial diseases most commonly found in cattle and other animals, such as bison, elk, and deer, as well as cattle, goats, and sheep. People can become infected with bovine tuberculosis and brucellosis by consuming contaminated, unpasteurized, raw milk or dairy products or through direct contact with infected live animals or carcasses; andWHEREAS, In the United States, it was once common for bovine tuberculosis and brucellosis to spread from animals to people, but efforts to eliminate both diseases in cattle and routine pasteurization of cows milk have led to a dramatic decline in the amount of human cases; andWHEREAS, In the early 1900s, about 20 percent of tuberculosis cases in humans were caused by bovine tuberculosis. Today, that number is less than 2 percent. From 1931 to 1941, about 29,600 cases of brucellosis in people were reported, but from 1993 to 2010, the number of reported human cases was less than 2,000; andWHEREAS, One Health Day provides an opportunity for experts and the community to join together in One Health education and awareness, including sharing stories about One Health in action, like the one detailed above; andWHEREAS, Communication, coordination, and collaboration among partners working in animal, human, and environmental health, as well as other relevant partners, are an essential part of the One Health approach; and WHEREAS, Working together allows us to have the biggest impact on improving health for people, animals, and our shared environment; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims November 3, 2021, as One Health Day, a global campaign that celebrates and brings attention to the need for a One Health approach to address shared health threats at the human-animal-environmental interface; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|