09/13/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 176, Statutes of 2022. | |||
09/13/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
Senate | 08/30/2022 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5340.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2022 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/08/2022 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 08/04/2022 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5757.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/04/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2021 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 09/07/2021 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2452.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 09/01/2021 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2021 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |