03/11/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 18, Statutes of 2022. | |||
03/11/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:45 a.m. | |||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3022.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2022 | (Corrected February 14). | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2022 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 3529.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 3). | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/20/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2022 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 01/14/2022 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 2764.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/03/2022 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |