1 | | - | Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 63 CHAPTER 19 Relative to Rose Ann Vuich Recognition Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State March 11, 2022. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 63, Hurtado. Rose Ann Vuich Recognition Day.This measure would proclaim January 27, 2022, as Rose Ann Vuich Recognition Day, in recognition of Senator Rose Ann Vuich as the first woman elected to the California State Senate, to honor Senator Vuichs service to the Senate, and to appropriately reflect the Senators stature and legacy.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Senator Rose Ann Vuich blazed a trail for women in the California Legislature by being the first woman elected to the State Senate; andWHEREAS, Senator Vuich was first elected to the Senate in 1976 and served four consecutive terms until 1992; andWHEREAS, Senator Vuich was a second-generation Serbian American from the small farm town of Dinuba, in Tulare County, California; andWHEREAS, Before election to the Senate, Senator Vuich had distinguished careers as a farmer, President of the Dinuba Chamber of Commerce, a tax accountant, an estate planner, and an office manager; andWHEREAS, Senator Vuich was an expert in agricultural development and international trade and chaired the California State Legislature Rural Caucus and the Senate Banking, Commerce, and International Trade Committee; andWHEREAS, Senator Vuich authored Californias Agricultural Export Finance Program, which became a national model; andWHEREAS, Senator Vuich authored legislation that created the former California Trade and Commerce Agency; andWHEREAS, Senator Vuich was the only woman in the California Senate for two years and served as the Senates female conscience by keeping a small porcelain bell to ring whenever a colleague addressed the gentlemen of the Senate, as a reminder that a gentlewoman was present in the chambers; andWHEREAS, Senator Vuich was a person of integrity who took public responsibilities very seriously and gave constituents fair, ethical consideration of issues and conscientious, cost-effective delivery of service; andWHEREAS, Senator Vuichs tenure in the California State Senate marked the beginning of positive change by paving the way for future women legislators who have joined that legacy. There are currently 15 women in the Senate and 24 in the Assembly; andWHEREAS, The restroom near the Senate Chamber was designated The Rose Room in Senator Vuichs honor, as it was installed because at the time there was no womens restroom nearby, and Committee Hearing Room 2040 is known as the Rose Ann Vuich Hearing Room; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates January 27, 2022, as Rose Ann Vuich Recognition Day, in recognition of Senator Rose Ann Vuich as the first woman elected to the California State Senate, to honor Senator Vuichs service to the Senate, and to appropriately reflect the Senators stature and legacy; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Chief Clerk of the Assembly and to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled March 08, 2022 Passed IN Senate January 26, 2022 Passed IN Assembly March 03, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 63Introduced by Senator Hurtado(Coauthors: Senators Atkins, Bates, Caballero, Durazo, Eggman, Gonzalez, Grove, Kamlager, Leyva, Limn, Melendez, Ochoa Bogh, Rubio, and Skinner)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Bauer-Kahan, Boerner Horvath, Mia Bonta, Calderon, Carrillo, Davies, Cristina Garcia, Petrie-Norris, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Blanca Rubio, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bennett, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Cervantes, Chen, Choi, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Megan Dahle, Daly, Fong, Mike Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gray, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Medina, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Nguyen, ODonnell, Patterson, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Salas, Santiago, Seyarto, Smith, Stone, Ting, Valladares, Villapudua, Voepel, Ward, Akilah Weber, Wicks, and Wood)January 03, 2022 Relative to Rose Ann Vuich Recognition Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 63, Hurtado. Rose Ann Vuich Recognition Day.This measure would proclaim January 27, 2022, as Rose Ann Vuich Recognition Day, in recognition of Senator Rose Ann Vuich as the first woman elected to the California State Senate, to honor Senator Vuichs service to the Senate, and to appropriately reflect the Senators stature and legacy.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Senator Rose Ann Vuich blazed a trail for women in the California Legislature by being the first woman elected to the State Senate; andWHEREAS, Senator Vuich was first elected to the Senate in 1976 and served four consecutive terms until 1992; andWHEREAS, Senator Vuich was a second-generation Serbian American from the small farm town of Dinuba, in Tulare County, California; andWHEREAS, Before election to the Senate, Senator Vuich had distinguished careers as a farmer, President of the Dinuba Chamber of Commerce, a tax accountant, an estate planner, and an office manager; andWHEREAS, Senator Vuich was an expert in agricultural development and international trade and chaired the California State Legislature Rural Caucus and the Senate Banking, Commerce, and International Trade Committee; andWHEREAS, Senator Vuich authored Californias Agricultural Export Finance Program, which became a national model; andWHEREAS, Senator Vuich authored legislation that created the former California Trade and Commerce Agency; andWHEREAS, Senator Vuich was the only woman in the California Senate for two years and served as the Senates female conscience by keeping a small porcelain bell to ring whenever a colleague addressed the gentlemen of the Senate, as a reminder that a gentlewoman was present in the chambers; andWHEREAS, Senator Vuich was a person of integrity who took public responsibilities very seriously and gave constituents fair, ethical consideration of issues and conscientious, cost-effective delivery of service; andWHEREAS, Senator Vuichs tenure in the California State Senate marked the beginning of positive change by paving the way for future women legislators who have joined that legacy. There are currently 15 women in the Senate and 24 in the Assembly; andWHEREAS, The restroom near the Senate Chamber was designated The Rose Room in Senator Vuichs honor, as it was installed because at the time there was no womens restroom nearby, and Committee Hearing Room 2040 is known as the Rose Ann Vuich Hearing Room; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates January 27, 2022, as Rose Ann Vuich Recognition Day, in recognition of Senator Rose Ann Vuich as the first woman elected to the California State Senate, to honor Senator Vuichs service to the Senate, and to appropriately reflect the Senators stature and legacy; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Chief Clerk of the Assembly and to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|