03/11/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2022. | |||
03/11/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:45 a.m. | |||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2022 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 3737.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 24). | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2022 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2975.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |