1 | | - | Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 78 CHAPTER 105 Relative to Los Angeles Firefighter Kelly Wong Memorial Highway. [ Filed with Secretary of State August 01, 2022. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 78, Durazo. Los Angeles Firefighter Kelly Wong Memorial Highway.This measure would designate a portion of southbound State Route 101, from the Temple St. ramp to the Broadway St. ramp, adjacent to the Cathedral of Our Lady of the Angels, as the Los Angeles Firefighter Kelly Wong Memorial Highway. This measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES Bill TextWHEREAS, Los Angeles Fire Department Firefighter Kelly Wong passed away in the line of duty on June 5, 2017, at the age of 29; and WHEREAS, Kelly Wong is survived by his loving wife, Danielle, and his six-year-old son, Colton; and WHEREAS, Kelly Wong moved to California in 1997 when he was eight years old with his mother, Anne; first attended college at Mt. San Antonio College, where he received his associate degree in fire technology, graduated with academic honors, and was recognized for his stewardship in the local community; and went on to receive his Bachelor of Science from Columbia Southern University, with a concentration in fire systems; andWHEREAS, Kelly Wong continued on to graduate and become a firefighter with the Los Angeles Fire Department on August 20, 2015, Drill Tower 40, Class 14-2, earning distinction in the firefighting academy and being named the Top Academic Recruit of his graduating class; andWHEREAS, In his free time, Kelly Wong enjoyed the outdoors, traveling, as well as learning new subjects and problem solving, and he was an avid aviation enthusiast who was in the process of obtaining his fixed wing private pilot rating from Universal Air Academy at Brackett Field Airport; and WHEREAS, Kelly Wong was just starting his career as a two-year veteran of the Los Angeles Fire Department, assigned to Fire Station 92 in Rancho Park and about to be transferred to Fire Station 9, the Downtown and Skid Row station when, on June 3, 2017, while participating in a training exercise in downtown Los Angeles, he unfortunately fell from an aerial ladder and suffered critical injuries; and WHEREAS, On June 5, 2017, Kelly Wong succumbed to those injuries; andWHEREAS, Kelly Wong was known to always have a smile on his face, especially when answering the call of duty as a firefighter to assist others in their most dire times of need; andWHEREAS, Kelly Wong exemplified the professionalism, work ethic, dedication, and self-sacrifice for which Los Angeles Fire Department firefighters are known, touched the lives of many, is sorely missed by all who knew him, and will never be forgotten; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the contributions of Los Angeles Fire Department Firefighter Kelly Wong to the people of California and hereby designates a portion of southbound State Route 101, from the Temple St. ramp to the Broadway St. ramp, adjacent to the Cathedral of Our Lady of the Angels, as the Los Angeles Firefighter Kelly Wong Memorial Highway; and be it furtherResolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost of the signs for which the donations were made, to erect those signs; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled July 13, 2022 Passed IN Senate April 28, 2022 Passed IN Assembly June 30, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 78Introduced by Senator Durazo(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Alvarez, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Bigelow, Boerner Horvath, Mia Bonta, Bryan, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chen, Choi, Cooley, Cooper, Megan Dahle, Daly, Davies, Flora, Fong, Mike Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gray, Grayson, Haney, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, McKinnor, Medina, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Nguyen, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Seyarto, Smith, Stone, Ting, Valladares, Voepel, Waldron, Ward, Akilah Weber, Wicks, Wilson, and Wood)March 01, 2022 Relative to Los Angeles Firefighter Kelly Wong Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 78, Durazo. Los Angeles Firefighter Kelly Wong Memorial Highway.This measure would designate a portion of southbound State Route 101, from the Temple St. ramp to the Broadway St. ramp, adjacent to the Cathedral of Our Lady of the Angels, as the Los Angeles Firefighter Kelly Wong Memorial Highway. This measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES Bill TextWHEREAS, Los Angeles Fire Department Firefighter Kelly Wong passed away in the line of duty on June 5, 2017, at the age of 29; and WHEREAS, Kelly Wong is survived by his loving wife, Danielle, and his six-year-old son, Colton; and WHEREAS, Kelly Wong moved to California in 1997 when he was eight years old with his mother, Anne; first attended college at Mt. San Antonio College, where he received his associate degree in fire technology, graduated with academic honors, and was recognized for his stewardship in the local community; and went on to receive his Bachelor of Science from Columbia Southern University, with a concentration in fire systems; andWHEREAS, Kelly Wong continued on to graduate and become a firefighter with the Los Angeles Fire Department on August 20, 2015, Drill Tower 40, Class 14-2, earning distinction in the firefighting academy and being named the Top Academic Recruit of his graduating class; andWHEREAS, In his free time, Kelly Wong enjoyed the outdoors, traveling, as well as learning new subjects and problem solving, and he was an avid aviation enthusiast who was in the process of obtaining his fixed wing private pilot rating from Universal Air Academy at Brackett Field Airport; and WHEREAS, Kelly Wong was just starting his career as a two-year veteran of the Los Angeles Fire Department, assigned to Fire Station 92 in Rancho Park and about to be transferred to Fire Station 9, the Downtown and Skid Row station when, on June 3, 2017, while participating in a training exercise in downtown Los Angeles, he unfortunately fell from an aerial ladder and suffered critical injuries; and WHEREAS, On June 5, 2017, Kelly Wong succumbed to those injuries; andWHEREAS, Kelly Wong was known to always have a smile on his face, especially when answering the call of duty as a firefighter to assist others in their most dire times of need; andWHEREAS, Kelly Wong exemplified the professionalism, work ethic, dedication, and self-sacrifice for which Los Angeles Fire Department firefighters are known, touched the lives of many, is sorely missed by all who knew him, and will never be forgotten; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the contributions of Los Angeles Fire Department Firefighter Kelly Wong to the people of California and hereby designates a portion of southbound State Route 101, from the Temple St. ramp to the Broadway St. ramp, adjacent to the Cathedral of Our Lady of the Angels, as the Los Angeles Firefighter Kelly Wong Memorial Highway; and be it furtherResolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost of the signs for which the donations were made, to erect those signs; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|