03/30/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2022. | |||
03/30/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 3138.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2022 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 52. Noes 17. Page 3813.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2022 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2022 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2022 | Assembly Rule 96 and 63 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 13. Page 3811.) | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2022 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 3036.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | (Corrected March 7.) | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Held at desk. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Introduced. |