08/01/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 106, Statutes of 2022. | |||
08/01/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 12 p.m. | |||
Senate | 06/27/2022 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2022 | Read. Adopted. (Page 5517.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 16). | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2022 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2022 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4014.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |