05/27/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 60, Statutes of 2022. | |||
05/27/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Senate | 05/19/2022 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4743.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 12). | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2022 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3554.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |