|
09/13/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 178, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2022
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5341.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5928.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Reyes.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2022
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2022
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3673.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 3522.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|