09/10/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 128, Statutes of 2021. | |||
09/10/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |||
Senate | 08/31/2021 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2021 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 60. Noes 2. Page 2562.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 8). | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2021 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2021 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 750.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 689.) (April 6). | ||
Senate | 03/23/2021 | Set for hearing April 6. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |