|
08/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 156, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2022
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 4897.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2022
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 5751.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2022
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Flora.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
June 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2022
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 3230.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3230.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Motion to reconsider made by Senator Limón.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2022
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 3229.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3061.) (March 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Set for hearing March 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2021
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|