California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR101 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/25/2022

                            Enrolled  August 25, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 23, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 101Introduced by Senator GroveAugust 04, 2022 Relative to Gold Star Mothers and Families Day.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 101, Grove. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, Honoring Gold Star families began in the United States after World War I to provide support for mothers who lost sons or daughters in the war; andWHEREAS, The reference to the Gold Star comes from the custom of families of service members hanging a service flag in the window of their homes displaying a blue star for every living family member in the United States Armed Forces and a gold star for those who have perished; andWHEREAS, The United States began observing Gold Star Mothers Day on the last Sunday of September in 1936, and the Gold Star Wives was formed before the end of World War II; andWHEREAS, Since 2009, the President of the United States has issued annual proclamations designating the last Sunday in September as Gold Star Mothers and Families Day, continuing the tradition of honoring the sacrifice of these families; andWHEREAS, The strength of our military is built upon the men and women who serve in uniform and the families who support them; andWHEREAS, Since 2001, more than 7,054 service members have lost their lives in the Global War on Terrorism; andWHEREAS, The families of our fallen soldiers have made a tremendous sacrifice on behalf of our country; andWHEREAS, All Gold Star families deserve to be recognized by our local, state, and federal leaders for their sacrifices and for their dedicated, patriotic support of the United States; andWHEREAS, Supporting Gold Star families demonstrates the commitment of the American people to those families now and in the future; andWHEREAS, As a nation, we must continually look for new ways to support Gold Star families both in the days immediately following their tragic loss and in the years that follow; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate hereby proclaims September 25, 2022, as Gold Star Mothers and Families Day in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  August 25, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 23, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 101Introduced by Senator GroveAugust 04, 2022 Relative to Gold Star Mothers and Families Day.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 101, Grove. Digest Key

 Enrolled  August 25, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 23, 2022

Enrolled  August 25, 2022
Passed IN  Senate  August 23, 2022

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Resolution 

No. 101

Introduced by Senator GroveAugust 04, 2022

Introduced by Senator Grove
August 04, 2022

 Relative to Gold Star Mothers and Families Day.

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 101, Grove. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Honoring Gold Star families began in the United States after World War I to provide support for mothers who lost sons or daughters in the war; and

WHEREAS, The reference to the Gold Star comes from the custom of families of service members hanging a service flag in the window of their homes displaying a blue star for every living family member in the United States Armed Forces and a gold star for those who have perished; and

WHEREAS, The United States began observing Gold Star Mothers Day on the last Sunday of September in 1936, and the Gold Star Wives was formed before the end of World War II; and

WHEREAS, Since 2009, the President of the United States has issued annual proclamations designating the last Sunday in September as Gold Star Mothers and Families Day, continuing the tradition of honoring the sacrifice of these families; and

WHEREAS, The strength of our military is built upon the men and women who serve in uniform and the families who support them; and

WHEREAS, Since 2001, more than 7,054 service members have lost their lives in the Global War on Terrorism; and

WHEREAS, The families of our fallen soldiers have made a tremendous sacrifice on behalf of our country; and

WHEREAS, All Gold Star families deserve to be recognized by our local, state, and federal leaders for their sacrifices and for their dedicated, patriotic support of the United States; and

WHEREAS, Supporting Gold Star families demonstrates the commitment of the American people to those families now and in the future; and

WHEREAS, As a nation, we must continually look for new ways to support Gold Star families both in the days immediately following their tragic loss and in the years that follow; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate hereby proclaims September 25, 2022, as Gold Star Mothers and Families Day in California; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.