California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR25 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/19/2021

                            Enrolled  April 19, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  April 15, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 25Introduced by Senator WieckowskiApril 05, 2021 Relative to Tamil Heritage Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 25, Wieckowski. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, The Tamil people originate from the southern state of Tamil Nadu in India, and they have immigrated to places like Sri Lanka, Singapore, Malaysia, Canada, and the United States; andWHEREAS, California is home to over 60,000 Tamil families and the bay area houses over 3,500 Tamil families; andWHEREAS, Tamil is the longest surviving classical language in the world, with a traceable history exceeding 2,600 years; andWHEREAS, There are more than 45 Tamil schools in the state and more than 10,000 children who learn Tamil. Many school districts in California have approved the study of the Tamil language for high school credit, and the Fremont-Hopkins campus in the City of Fremont, a Tamil academy, hosts over 3,000 children; andWHEREAS, Tamil language and literature have been taught at the University of California, Berkeley, for over 40 years, where the program, recognized as one of the worlds leading programs in Tamil studies, has its own chair in Tamil studies, a prestigious annual conference, and supports student research in Tamil studies; andWHEREAS, Tamils have established deep roots and flourished in communities across California, enriching its social, economic, and political fabric. The International Tamil Academy and other nonprofit organizations host cultural activities to celebrate and exhibit music, dance, drama, and any artform based on Tamil language and Tamil culture; andWHEREAS, Some of the brightest Tamil minds have made the bay area their home and made significant contributions to the technology industry and the state. Such notable Tamil Californians include Vice President Kamala Harris, who has maternal roots in Chennai, the capital city of the Indian state of Tamil Nadu, and Sundar Pichai, CEO of Alphabet, the parent company of Google, among others; andWHEREAS, The Tamil community across the globe every year celebrates its new year, also known as Varusha Pirappu, on April 14, which falls on the first day of Chithirai, the first month in the Tamil calendar; andWHEREAS, The Tamil community of the bay area welcomes and encourages all people across the bay area and California to participate in this celebration, and to experience their rich and inclusive heritage; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate hereby declares April 14, 2021, to be Tamil Heritage Day; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. .

 Enrolled  April 19, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  April 15, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 25Introduced by Senator WieckowskiApril 05, 2021 Relative to Tamil Heritage Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 25, Wieckowski. Digest Key

 Enrolled  April 19, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  April 15, 2021

Enrolled  April 19, 2021
Passed IN  Senate  April 15, 2021

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Resolution 

No. 25

Introduced by Senator WieckowskiApril 05, 2021

Introduced by Senator Wieckowski
April 05, 2021

 Relative to Tamil Heritage Day. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 25, Wieckowski. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, The Tamil people originate from the southern state of Tamil Nadu in India, and they have immigrated to places like Sri Lanka, Singapore, Malaysia, Canada, and the United States; and

WHEREAS, California is home to over 60,000 Tamil families and the bay area houses over 3,500 Tamil families; and

WHEREAS, Tamil is the longest surviving classical language in the world, with a traceable history exceeding 2,600 years; and

WHEREAS, There are more than 45 Tamil schools in the state and more than 10,000 children who learn Tamil. Many school districts in California have approved the study of the Tamil language for high school credit, and the Fremont-Hopkins campus in the City of Fremont, a Tamil academy, hosts over 3,000 children; and

WHEREAS, Tamil language and literature have been taught at the University of California, Berkeley, for over 40 years, where the program, recognized as one of the worlds leading programs in Tamil studies, has its own chair in Tamil studies, a prestigious annual conference, and supports student research in Tamil studies; and

WHEREAS, Tamils have established deep roots and flourished in communities across California, enriching its social, economic, and political fabric. The International Tamil Academy and other nonprofit organizations host cultural activities to celebrate and exhibit music, dance, drama, and any artform based on Tamil language and Tamil culture; and

WHEREAS, Some of the brightest Tamil minds have made the bay area their home and made significant contributions to the technology industry and the state. Such notable Tamil Californians include Vice President Kamala Harris, who has maternal roots in Chennai, the capital city of the Indian state of Tamil Nadu, and Sundar Pichai, CEO of Alphabet, the parent company of Google, among others; and

WHEREAS, The Tamil community across the globe every year celebrates its new year, also known as Varusha Pirappu, on April 14, which falls on the first day of Chithirai, the first month in the Tamil calendar; and

WHEREAS, The Tamil community of the bay area welcomes and encourages all people across the bay area and California to participate in this celebration, and to experience their rich and inclusive heritage; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate hereby declares April 14, 2021, to be Tamil Heritage Day; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. .