California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR58 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 09/14/2021

                            Enrolled  September 14, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  September 10, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 58Introduced by Senator PanAugust 23, 2021 Relative to Concrete Pipe Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 58, Pan. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, The week of August 15 through August 21, 2021, has been declared Concrete Pipe Week for the purpose of recognizing the vital importance of reinforced concrete pipe and precast products to sustainable communities and the health, and well-being of the people of California; andWHEREAS, These resilient products are critical in the states efforts to withstand the impact of climate change and wildfires; andWHEREAS, Reinforced concrete pipe, precast products, and services could not be provided without the dedicated efforts of the concrete pipe and precast industry manufacturers, professionals, engineers, managers, and employees who are together responsible for designing, manufacturing, distributing, educating, and supplying concrete pipe and precast products to public and private owners who in turn build, design and maintain transportation infrastructure, water supply, water treatment systems, solid waste systems, and other structures and facilities essential to modern society; andWHEREAS, Celebrating its 114th anniversary during the year 2021, the American Concrete Pipe Association began as a means of exchanging ideas and establishing a high-quality, standardized product, which is fully supported by the American Concrete Pipe Association of California; andWHEREAS, Over the years, numerous residents and civic leaders throughout California have gained knowledge and maintained a progressive interest and understanding of the importance of the reinforced concrete pipe industry to every community throughout California and the United States; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate encourages the attention of the public be drawn to the reinforced concrete pipe and precast industry for its numerous contributions to the enhancement of the quality of life in California, and that the period between August 15 and August 21, 2021, be recognized as Concrete Pipe Week; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  September 14, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  September 10, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 58Introduced by Senator PanAugust 23, 2021 Relative to Concrete Pipe Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 58, Pan. Digest Key

 Enrolled  September 14, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  September 10, 2021

Enrolled  September 14, 2021
Passed IN  Senate  September 10, 2021

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Resolution 

No. 58

Introduced by Senator PanAugust 23, 2021

Introduced by Senator Pan
August 23, 2021

 Relative to Concrete Pipe Week. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 58, Pan. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, The week of August 15 through August 21, 2021, has been declared Concrete Pipe Week for the purpose of recognizing the vital importance of reinforced concrete pipe and precast products to sustainable communities and the health, and well-being of the people of California; and

WHEREAS, These resilient products are critical in the states efforts to withstand the impact of climate change and wildfires; and

WHEREAS, Reinforced concrete pipe, precast products, and services could not be provided without the dedicated efforts of the concrete pipe and precast industry manufacturers, professionals, engineers, managers, and employees who are together responsible for designing, manufacturing, distributing, educating, and supplying concrete pipe and precast products to public and private owners who in turn build, design and maintain transportation infrastructure, water supply, water treatment systems, solid waste systems, and other structures and facilities essential to modern society; and

WHEREAS, Celebrating its 114th anniversary during the year 2021, the American Concrete Pipe Association began as a means of exchanging ideas and establishing a high-quality, standardized product, which is fully supported by the American Concrete Pipe Association of California; and

WHEREAS, Over the years, numerous residents and civic leaders throughout California have gained knowledge and maintained a progressive interest and understanding of the importance of the reinforced concrete pipe industry to every community throughout California and the United States; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate encourages the attention of the public be drawn to the reinforced concrete pipe and precast industry for its numerous contributions to the enhancement of the quality of life in California, and that the period between August 15 and August 21, 2021, be recognized as Concrete Pipe Week; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.