Senate | 04/19/2021 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 834.) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2021 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2021 | Read third time and amended. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 423.) (March 9). | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Set for hearing March 9. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2021 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |