California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR65 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/15/2022

                            Enrolled  February 15, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  February 14, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 65Introduced by Senator GroveJanuary 26, 2022 Relative to National Human Trafficking Awareness Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 65, Grove. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, For more than two centuries, the United States has worked to advance the cause of freedom, serving as a beacon of hope for those who cherish liberty and opportunity and leading the fight for the dignity and inalienable rights of every person; andWHEREAS, Classified as a felony, human trafficking is a form of modern day slavery. It is a crime that involves the use of force, fraud, or coercion to recruit, harbor, transport, provide, or obtain a person for the purpose of labor or sexual exploitation; andWHEREAS, According to the United States Department of States 2018 Trafficking in Persons Report, 170 countries have made public commitments to the eradication of human trafficking; andWHEREAS, The International Labor Organization (ILO) estimated that there were 40,300,000 victims of human trafficking globally in 2016; andWHEREAS, According to the ILO, in 2016, 81 percent of human trafficking victims were trapped in forced labor, 25 percent were children, and 75 percent were women and girls; andWHEREAS, The ILO estimated that, in 2016, $150,000,000,000 was made from forced labor; andWHEREAS, According to the United States Department of States 2018 Trafficking in Persons Report, the United States is a primary source, transit, and destination country for human trafficking, both for citizens and foreign nationals; andWHEREAS, In 2019 alone, federal law enforcement agencies initiated more than 1,600 new investigations into human traffickers and the United States Department of Justices human trafficking task forces opened more than 2,500 new cases on the frontlines; andWHEREAS, The National Human Trafficking Hotline reported in 2018 that California is a primary location for human trafficking; andWHEREAS, The Legislature recognizes the continuously growing crime of human trafficking within California due to its ever-increasing population, extensive international border, large immigrant population, and primary airports and harbors; andWHEREAS, The State of California is committed to combating all forms of human trafficking, recovering victims, prosecuting offenders, advocating on behalf of victims, raising community awareness, and strengthening collaborative partnerships; andWHEREAS, National Slavery and Human Trafficking Prevention Month culminates in the annual observation of National Freedom Day on February 1, 2022; andWHEREAS, Founded on the principles of justice and fairness, the United States continues to lead the global movement to end modern day slavery, with agencies and skilled professionals at the local, state, and national levels conducting investigations, collaborations, and trainings, organizing public outreach and promoting awareness, and directly assisting the victims of human trafficking; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate recognizes the month of January 2022 as National Human Trafficking Awareness Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  February 15, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  February 14, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 65Introduced by Senator GroveJanuary 26, 2022 Relative to National Human Trafficking Awareness Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 65, Grove. Digest Key

 Enrolled  February 15, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  February 14, 2022

Enrolled  February 15, 2022
Passed IN  Senate  February 14, 2022

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Resolution 

No. 65

Introduced by Senator GroveJanuary 26, 2022

Introduced by Senator Grove
January 26, 2022

 Relative to National Human Trafficking Awareness Month. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 65, Grove. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, For more than two centuries, the United States has worked to advance the cause of freedom, serving as a beacon of hope for those who cherish liberty and opportunity and leading the fight for the dignity and inalienable rights of every person; and

WHEREAS, Classified as a felony, human trafficking is a form of modern day slavery. It is a crime that involves the use of force, fraud, or coercion to recruit, harbor, transport, provide, or obtain a person for the purpose of labor or sexual exploitation; and

WHEREAS, According to the United States Department of States 2018 Trafficking in Persons Report, 170 countries have made public commitments to the eradication of human trafficking; and

WHEREAS, The International Labor Organization (ILO) estimated that there were 40,300,000 victims of human trafficking globally in 2016; and

WHEREAS, According to the ILO, in 2016, 81 percent of human trafficking victims were trapped in forced labor, 25 percent were children, and 75 percent were women and girls; and

WHEREAS, The ILO estimated that, in 2016, $150,000,000,000 was made from forced labor; and

WHEREAS, According to the United States Department of States 2018 Trafficking in Persons Report, the United States is a primary source, transit, and destination country for human trafficking, both for citizens and foreign nationals; and

WHEREAS, In 2019 alone, federal law enforcement agencies initiated more than 1,600 new investigations into human traffickers and the United States Department of Justices human trafficking task forces opened more than 2,500 new cases on the frontlines; and

WHEREAS, The National Human Trafficking Hotline reported in 2018 that California is a primary location for human trafficking; and

WHEREAS, The Legislature recognizes the continuously growing crime of human trafficking within California due to its ever-increasing population, extensive international border, large immigrant population, and primary airports and harbors; and

WHEREAS, The State of California is committed to combating all forms of human trafficking, recovering victims, prosecuting offenders, advocating on behalf of victims, raising community awareness, and strengthening collaborative partnerships; and

WHEREAS, National Slavery and Human Trafficking Prevention Month culminates in the annual observation of National Freedom Day on February 1, 2022; and

WHEREAS, Founded on the principles of justice and fairness, the United States continues to lead the global movement to end modern day slavery, with agencies and skilled professionals at the local, state, and national levels conducting investigations, collaborations, and trainings, organizing public outreach and promoting awareness, and directly assisting the victims of human trafficking; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate recognizes the month of January 2022 as National Human Trafficking Awareness Month; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.