California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR91 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/10/2022

                            Enrolled  August 10, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 08, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  August 01, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 91Introduced by Senator Limn(Coauthors: Senators Dodd, Hertzberg, Nielsen, Roth, Skinner, and Wiener)May 18, 2022Relative to California Native American Day and the California Indian Cultural Awareness Conference. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 91, Limn. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, More Native Americans call California home and the state includes more federally recognized Indian tribes than any other state in the United States; andWHEREAS, The cultural and governmental contributions of the Native people of California have shaped the course of the state throughout history; andWHEREAS, California designates the fourth Friday of every September as Native American Day; andWHEREAS, California Native American Day is celebrated in this state by tribes and communities across the state, and is a day for educators of California to teach factual California Indian history in schools; andWHEREAS, California Indian tribes are committed to contributing to the educational curricula provided by the state and believe in providing new and improved educational resources about the varied cultural histories of, and governance models used by, California Native Americans; andWHEREAS, One notable example of the preservation and teaching of those varied cultural histories is Robert Levi, a Torres Martinez Desert Cahuilla Indian from the Torres Martinez Indian Reservation, who was instrumental in retaining and teaching Desert Cahuilla bird songs to connect all with ancient knowledge of the world and tell the story of how the ancestors came to the homelands; andWHEREAS, This is the fourth California Native American Day since Governor Gavin Newsom issued an executive order apologizing for the historical wrongs tolerated, encouraged, subsidized, and committed by state actors against California Native Americans; andWHEREAS, We can never undo the wrongs inflicted on the people who have lived on this land that we now call California, but we can work together to build bridges, tell the truth about Californias past, and begin to heal deep wounds; andWHEREAS, The Governor has also called for a Truth and Healing Council to hear testimony and clarify the historical record on the relationship between the state and California Native Americans; andWHEREAS, The California Indian Cultural Awareness Conference will be held concurrently with California Native American Day and will assist educators by providing new educational resources regarding the rich and varied lives of the California Indian Nations; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate recognizes the importance of California Native American Day, celebrated this year on September 23, 2022, and the annual California Indian Cultural Awareness Conference, to the enhancement of awareness of California Indian culture; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  August 10, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 08, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  August 01, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 91Introduced by Senator Limn(Coauthors: Senators Dodd, Hertzberg, Nielsen, Roth, Skinner, and Wiener)May 18, 2022Relative to California Native American Day and the California Indian Cultural Awareness Conference. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 91, Limn. Digest Key

 Enrolled  August 10, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 08, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  August 01, 2022

Enrolled  August 10, 2022
Passed IN  Senate  August 08, 2022
Amended IN  Senate  August 01, 2022

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Resolution 

No. 91

Introduced by Senator Limn(Coauthors: Senators Dodd, Hertzberg, Nielsen, Roth, Skinner, and Wiener)May 18, 2022

Introduced by Senator Limn(Coauthors: Senators Dodd, Hertzberg, Nielsen, Roth, Skinner, and Wiener)
May 18, 2022

Relative to California Native American Day and the California Indian Cultural Awareness Conference. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 91, Limn. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, More Native Americans call California home and the state includes more federally recognized Indian tribes than any other state in the United States; and

WHEREAS, The cultural and governmental contributions of the Native people of California have shaped the course of the state throughout history; and

WHEREAS, California designates the fourth Friday of every September as Native American Day; and

WHEREAS, California Native American Day is celebrated in this state by tribes and communities across the state, and is a day for educators of California to teach factual California Indian history in schools; and

WHEREAS, California Indian tribes are committed to contributing to the educational curricula provided by the state and believe in providing new and improved educational resources about the varied cultural histories of, and governance models used by, California Native Americans; and

WHEREAS, One notable example of the preservation and teaching of those varied cultural histories is Robert Levi, a Torres Martinez Desert Cahuilla Indian from the Torres Martinez Indian Reservation, who was instrumental in retaining and teaching Desert Cahuilla bird songs to connect all with ancient knowledge of the world and tell the story of how the ancestors came to the homelands; and

WHEREAS, This is the fourth California Native American Day since Governor Gavin Newsom issued an executive order apologizing for the historical wrongs tolerated, encouraged, subsidized, and committed by state actors against California Native Americans; and

WHEREAS, We can never undo the wrongs inflicted on the people who have lived on this land that we now call California, but we can work together to build bridges, tell the truth about Californias past, and begin to heal deep wounds; and

WHEREAS, The Governor has also called for a Truth and Healing Council to hear testimony and clarify the historical record on the relationship between the state and California Native Americans; and

WHEREAS, The California Indian Cultural Awareness Conference will be held concurrently with California Native American Day and will assist educators by providing new educational resources regarding the rich and varied lives of the California Indian Nations; now, therefore, be it 

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate recognizes the importance of California Native American Day, celebrated this year on September 23, 2022, and the annual California Indian Cultural Awareness Conference, to the enhancement of awareness of California Indian culture; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.