California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR99 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/12/2022

                            Enrolled  August 12, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 11, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 99Introduced by Senator PanAugust 03, 2022 Relative to American Academy of Pediatrics Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 99, Pan. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, The State of California appreciates the American Academy of Pediatrics and its member pediatricians for dedicating their efforts and resources to the health, safety, and well-being of infants, children, adolescents, and young adults; andWHEREAS, The American Academy of Pediatrics is Americas leading professional association of pediatricians comprised of over 67,000 pediatricians committed to the optimal physical, mental, and social health and well-being for all infants, children, adolescents, and young adults; andWHEREAS, The origin of the American Academy of Pediatrics can be traced to a dinner during the American Medical Association Section on Diseases of Children meeting on July 19, 1929, as described in a letter by William P. Lucas, MD of San Francisco, California; andWHEREAS, California welcomes the American Academy of Pediatrics for their first in-person National Conference and Exhibition since the start of the COVID-19 pandemic, which is taking place from October 7, 2022, to October 11, 2022, in Anaheim, California; and WHEREAS, The 2022 Conference and Exhibition will bring pediatricians from across our country and the world to network, participate in educational sessions, and attend special events and exhibit halls; andWHEREAS, California has experienced some of the highest rates of COVID-19 vaccination for pediatric patients in the nation, with 44 percent of children 5 to 11 years of age and 83 percent of children 12 to 17 years of age having received at least one dose of the COVID-19 vaccine; andWHEREAS, Californias over 4,000 pediatricians have been a trusted voice for parents and the public at large about the health and well-being of children, including providing access to COVID-19 vaccinations and other vaccinations for children; andWHEREAS, Californias pediatricians advocated for schools in our state to safely open and remain open during the 202021 school year so that children did not miss out on the immeasurable benefits of in-person learning; andWHEREAS, The American Academy of Pediatrics has ensured the health and well-being of children by promoting nurturing, inclusive environments and actively opposing intolerance, bigotry, bias, and discrimination; and WHEREAS, The American Academy of Pediatrics has provided education, training, and program implementation across the globe for the health and well-being of all children, adolescents, and young adults; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate recognizes July 19 as American Academy of Pediatrics Day; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  August 12, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 11, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 99Introduced by Senator PanAugust 03, 2022 Relative to American Academy of Pediatrics Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 99, Pan. Digest Key

 Enrolled  August 12, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 11, 2022

Enrolled  August 12, 2022
Passed IN  Senate  August 11, 2022

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Resolution 

No. 99

Introduced by Senator PanAugust 03, 2022

Introduced by Senator Pan
August 03, 2022

 Relative to American Academy of Pediatrics Day. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 99, Pan. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, The State of California appreciates the American Academy of Pediatrics and its member pediatricians for dedicating their efforts and resources to the health, safety, and well-being of infants, children, adolescents, and young adults; and

WHEREAS, The American Academy of Pediatrics is Americas leading professional association of pediatricians comprised of over 67,000 pediatricians committed to the optimal physical, mental, and social health and well-being for all infants, children, adolescents, and young adults; and

WHEREAS, The origin of the American Academy of Pediatrics can be traced to a dinner during the American Medical Association Section on Diseases of Children meeting on July 19, 1929, as described in a letter by William P. Lucas, MD of San Francisco, California; and

WHEREAS, California welcomes the American Academy of Pediatrics for their first in-person National Conference and Exhibition since the start of the COVID-19 pandemic, which is taking place from October 7, 2022, to October 11, 2022, in Anaheim, California; and 

WHEREAS, The 2022 Conference and Exhibition will bring pediatricians from across our country and the world to network, participate in educational sessions, and attend special events and exhibit halls; and

WHEREAS, California has experienced some of the highest rates of COVID-19 vaccination for pediatric patients in the nation, with 44 percent of children 5 to 11 years of age and 83 percent of children 12 to 17 years of age having received at least one dose of the COVID-19 vaccine; and

WHEREAS, Californias over 4,000 pediatricians have been a trusted voice for parents and the public at large about the health and well-being of children, including providing access to COVID-19 vaccinations and other vaccinations for children; and

WHEREAS, Californias pediatricians advocated for schools in our state to safely open and remain open during the 202021 school year so that children did not miss out on the immeasurable benefits of in-person learning; and

WHEREAS, The American Academy of Pediatrics has ensured the health and well-being of children by promoting nurturing, inclusive environments and actively opposing intolerance, bigotry, bias, and discrimination; and 

WHEREAS, The American Academy of Pediatrics has provided education, training, and program implementation across the globe for the health and well-being of all children, adolescents, and young adults; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate recognizes July 19 as American Academy of Pediatrics Day; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.