California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1007 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2023

Amended

Bill September 8, 2023
Bill June 29, 2023