|
10/07/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 353, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2879.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2140.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1686.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1553.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|