|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 554, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3042.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3011.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2391.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1269.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|