California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1034 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2024

Amended

Bill August 21, 2024
Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023