Assembly
|
02/01/2024
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2024
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2024
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2023
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1297.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|