Assembly | 02/01/2024 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2023 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2023 | Read first time. To print. |