California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1060 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2023

Amended

Bill September 8, 2023
Bill September 1, 2023
Bill June 12, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023