California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1063 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2023

Amended

Bill September 1, 2023
Bill July 13, 2023
Bill April 27, 2023
Bill March 30, 2023