|
09/25/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 229, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 17. Page 3056.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 62. Noes 17. Page 3054.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3056.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 2459.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 16. Page 1893.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|