|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 560, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 14. Page 3032.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 2370.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 15. Page 1482.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|