Assembly | 02/01/2024 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2023 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2023 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2023 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2023 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2023 | Read first time. To print. |