Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1898.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|