California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1113 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2024

Amended

Bill August 27, 2024
Bill September 1, 2023
Bill July 5, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023