California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1114 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023