California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1122 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2024

Amended

Bill July 3, 2024
Bill May 29, 2024
Bill May 1, 2024
Bill September 13, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023