|
10/07/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 356, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3194.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2482.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1412.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|