California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1137 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2024

Amended

Bill July 3, 2024
Bill June 11, 2024