California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1139 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2023

Chaptered

Bill September 1, 2023

Amended

Bill June 7, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023