Assembly
|
01/25/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
10/08/2023
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 3. Page 2555.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1762.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|