Assembly | 02/01/2024 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2023 | Read first time. To print. |