California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1203 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2023

Amended

Bill June 14, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023