|
09/27/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 677, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 3.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Joint Rules 61 and 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hurtado.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 17. Page 1690.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|