Assembly | 02/01/2024 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2023 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2023 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 25). | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2023 | Referred to Coms. on ELECTIONS and P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2023 | Read first time. To print. |