Assembly
|
02/01/2024
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2024
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2023
|
Measure version as amended on April 17 corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|